Hercz, Amos Raphael (CPSO#: 82248)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Santa Cabrini
5655 rue St Zotique East
Montréal QC  H1T 1P7
Phone: (514) 252-6000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMOS RAPHAEL HERCZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERCZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Mar 2005 to 10 Apr 2005
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007