Hermann, David Michael (CPSO#: 83839)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Adelaide, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Nov 2005 to 15 Dec 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Dec 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2006