Hermann, Laura Lynne (CPSO#: 86039)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2007 to 27 Apr 2007
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007