Hernandez Murcia, Lizeth Alexandra (CPSO#: 86400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Sep 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Nov 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Juan N. Corpas, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1440 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Nov 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Lizeth  Alexandra  Hernandez Murcia may practise paediatrics at 1440
                  Bathurst Street in Toronto,  Ontario, while under supervision coordinated
                  by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  on September 30,
                  2019.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon  the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Hernandez Murcia's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not
                        provide  the  required reports to the College by the due date or if
                        the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Hernandez Murcia's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on November 1, 2018, and will expire on or
                  before September 30, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.