Hertzman, Daniel (CPSO#: 83255)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
262 Oxford St. East
London ON  N6A 1T8
Phone: 888-495-5898
Fax: 855-745-5878
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hertzman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hertzman ( CPSO# 86545 )
Dr. D. Hertzman ( CPSO# 83255 )

Business Address:
Palliative Care Unit
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (226) 400-3876

Business Address:
485 Windermere Road
London ON  N5X 2T1

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL HERTZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERTZMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010