Heymans, Gerry Adrianes (CPSO#: 31373)

Current Status: Suspended as of 17 Nov 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Mar 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerry Heymans Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Heymans ( CPSO# 31373 )

Business Address:
110 Craig Street
P.O. Box 610
Russell ON  K4R 1E7
Phone Number: (613) 445-5333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 08 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 04 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Oct 2018
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2018

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 17 Nov 2018


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2018 Active

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Oct 2018
Summary:

On October 12, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Gerry Adrianes Heymans committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant 
to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  
 
Disposition 
 
On October 12, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-    the Registrar suspend Dr. Heymans’ Certificate of Registration for a three (3) month period 
     effective 12:01 a.m. on November 17, 2018.  
-    the  Registrar  impose  the  following  terms,  conditions  and  limitations  on  Dr.  Heymans’ 
     Certificate of Registration: 
     -  Dr. Heymans shall only practice medicine in facilities designated as Retirement Homes 
        and/or Long-term Care Homes, as defined in the Retirement Homes Act, 2010, S.O. 2010 
        c.11  and  the Long-Term  Care  Homes  Act,  2007,  S.O.  2007,  c.8,  and  associated 
        Regulations, unless otherwise approved of in writing by the College;  
     -  Dr. Heymans shall engage in direct patient care no more than thirty (30) hours per week, 
        and this restriction supersedes Dr. Heymans’ undertaking signed on March 8, 2013, in so 
        far as the maximum number of hours he is permitted to work per week;  
     -  Dr.  Heymans  shall  not  engage  in  any  professional  encounters,  in  person  or  otherwise 
        (“Professional Encounter(s)”), with patients of any age, unless in the continuous presence 
        and under the direct observation of a monitor (the “Monitor”) who is a regulated health 
        professional and employed at the facility where Dr. Heymans provides care;  
     -  Dr.  Heymans  shall  maintain  a  log  (“the  Log”)  of  all  Professional  Encounters  with 
        patients. Dr. Heymans shall ensure that the Monitor initials each entry on the Log for each 
        patient  seen  in  the  Professional  Encounter    and  shall  make  this  Log  available  to  the 
        College upon request; 
     -  Dr. Heymans shall annually submit to the College, a report prepared by his sleep disorder 
        specialist  or  his  family  physician,  regarding  Dr.  Heymans  sleep  disorder,  commencing 
        within one year of the date of this Order;   
     -  Dr. Heymans shall inform the College of each and every location where he practices, in 
        any  jurisdiction  (collectively  my  “Practice  Location(s)”)  within  fifteen  (15)  days  of 
        commencing practice at that location;  
     -  Dr. Heymans shall be responsible for any and all fees, costs, and expenses, associated 
        with implementing and fulfilling the terms of this Order; and 
     -  Dr.  Heymans  shall  provide  irrevocable  consent  to  the  College  to  make  appropriate 
        enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution that may have relevant information, in 
        order for the College to monitor compliance with this Order.  
-    Dr. Heymans appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-    Dr. Heymans pay costs to the College in the amount of  $6,000.00 within thirty (30) days of 
     the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): October 12, 2018 1:00 p.m. start

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 4, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gerry Adrianes Heymans to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 13, 2016:
The College received information about Dr. Heymans’ standard of practice. As a result of the information:

• Dr. Heymans will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.
• Dr. Heymans will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping.
• Dr. Heymans’ practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 12 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.