Hibbert, Benjamin Malcolm (CPSO#: 84452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 4238
40 Ruskin Ave
K1Y4w7
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7001
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Hibbert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hibbert ( CPSO# 84452 )

Business Address:
Cardiology Program
4238-40 Ruskin Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7001

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN MALCOLM HIBBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIBBERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2010