Hickey, Kristin Margaret (CPSO#: 75118)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Community Centre
The University of Western Ontario
Room 25
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-2047
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Oct 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTIN MARGARET HICKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HICKEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2002