Hickey, Michael Allan (CPSO#: 85084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
270 King George Road
Brantford ON  N3R 5L5
Phone: (519) 512-2444
Fax: (519) 512-2445
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brantford General Hospital
Brantford ON  N3R1G9
Canada
Phone: (519)751-5544 Ext. 0
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael A. Hickey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hickey ( CPSO# 85084 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
3rd Floor, E Wing
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5860

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALLAN HICKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HICKEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2012