Hii, John Hilary (CPSO#: 55875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Fukien, Malay

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
372 Bay Street
Suite 401
Toronto ON  M5H 2W9
Phone: (416) 350-3555
Fax: (416) 350-3167
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN HILARY HII may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HII is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 May 1992 to 09 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1990