Hilborn, Mark Douglas (CPSO#: 62126)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
St Mary's Hospital
111E Spring Street
Streator IL  61364
United States
Phone: (815) 673-4640

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002