Hildebrand, Ainslie Marie (CPSO#: 90319)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: University of Edmonton Alberta, 11-112R Clinical Sciences Building, 152 University Campus, Edmonton, AB, T6G 2G3
Date Received: 16 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2016