Hildebrand, Kyla Jade (CPSO#: 85424)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kyla J. Hildebrand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 30 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 02 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2006 to 27 Aug 2006
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 18 Nov 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Mar 2008 to 06 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2013