Hill, Deborah Mary Kathleen (CPSO#: 88892)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 25 Aug 2011 to 21 Sep 2011
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2011