Hill, Karen Louise (CPSO#: 79973)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3534 6th Line
R R 2
Ohsweken ON  N0A 1M0
Phone: (905) 765-1213
Fax: (905) 765-1233
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN LOUISE HILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Apr 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2005