Hillyard, David George (CPSO#: 27059)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Family Practice medical records are located at: Cottage Country Family Health Team 5 Pineridge Gate Gravenhurst ON P1P 1Z3 Muskoka Shores LTC medical records are located at: 200 Kelly Drive Gravenhurst ON P1P 1P3
Date Received: 01 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018