Hilsden, Richard (CPSO#: 84915)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3269
Fax: (519) 663-3068
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4211
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Hilsden Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hilsden ( CPSO# 86859 )
Dr. R. Hilsden ( CPSO# 84915 )

Business Address:
310 Juliana Drive
Campbellford ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
Londesborough ON  N6A 5A5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD HILSDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILSDEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008