Hingwala, Jay Pravin (CPSO#: 94220)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2010 to 25 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015