Hiraki, Linda Tayeko (CPSO#: 79353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5828
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA TAYEKO HIRAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRAKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2010