Hiram-Karasmanis, Rania (CPSO#: 77664)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
211 - 5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 797-0800
Fax: (705) 797-0900
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Regional
Health Centre
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9802
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karasmanis Hiram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Karasmanis ( CPSO# 79558 )
Dr. R. Hiram-Karasmanis ( CPSO# 77664 )

Business Address:
c/o Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 718-0571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Nov 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANIA HIRAM-KARASMANIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRAM-KARASMANIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Mar 2006 to 30 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2006