Hiremath, Swapnil Satayya (CPSO#: 80903)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus Site
Division of Nephrology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82762
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hiremath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hiremath ( CPSO# 80903 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus Site
Division of Nephrology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 01 Jul 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2004 to 04 Jul 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 05 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 May 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Swapnil Satayya Hiremath may practise medicine independently in nephrology,
            only.