Hirji, Mohamed Mustafa (CPSO#: 94184)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Region Public Health
1815 Sir Isaac Brock Way
P.O. Box 1042
Thorold ON  L2V 4T7
Phone: (905) 688-8248 Ext. 7466
Fax: 905-682-3901
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED MUSTAFA HIRJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015