Hirji, Rahim (CPSO#: 81075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Richmond Hill Medical and
After Hours Clinic
301 High Tech Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 4R2
Phone: (905) 709-4274
Fax: (905) 709-4985
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mountain Medical Clinic
880 Upper Wentworth St
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H2
Canada
Phone: (905) 575-0808
Fax: (905) 574-3003
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rahim Hirji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hirji ( CPSO# 81075 )

Business Address:
Richmond Hill Medical and After Hours Clinic
301 High Tech Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 4R2
Phone Number: (905) 709-4274

Business Address:
880 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H2
Phone Number: (905) 575-0808

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAHIM HIRJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006