Hirschfield, Gideon Morris (CPSO#: 87751)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2018

Expiry Date:  06 Feb 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Aug 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
Rm TGH 9EN - 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3569
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gideon Hirschfield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 03 Aug 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 06 Feb 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Gideon Morris Hirschfield may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Gastroenterology, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Hirschfield holds  an  academic  appointment  at  the  rank of Full
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The   certificate   of   registration   automatically  expires  when  Dr.
                  Hirschfield no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on August 3, 2018,  and  currently  has  an
                  interim  expiry date of February  6,  2021.   The  expiry  date  of  this
                  certificate may be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2.