Hirshberg, Eric David (CPSO#: 62464)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
77 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone: (519) 824-7272
Fax: (519) 824-0833
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

180 Sandalwood Parkway
Brampton ON  L6Z 1Y4
Canada
Phone: (905) 846-9255
Fax: (905) 846-2525
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

1 Eglinton
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1
Canada
Phone: (416) 636-7377
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

South Bruce Grey Health Centre
21 McGivern Street West
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Canada
Phone: (519) 881-1220
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Hirshberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hirshberg ( CPSO# 62464 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
77 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone Number: (519) 824-7272

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
Unit 400
1 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1
Phone Number: (416) 636-7377

Business Address:
South Bruce Grey Health Centre
21 McGivern Street West
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Phone Number: (519) 881-1220

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 08 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC DAVID HIRSHBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRSHBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991