Ho, Angela Luoh-Hua (CPSO#: 74000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6073
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 74000 )

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA LUOH-HUA HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2004