Ho, Chung-Han John (CPSO#: 75256)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Athlete's Care
Suite C-120
11 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5H 4C7
Phone: (416) 368-9990
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. John Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ho ( CPSO# 75256 )
Dr. R. Ho ( CPSO# 24528 )

Business Address:
Athlete's Care
C 120 - 11 King Street
Toronto ON  M5H 4C7
Phone Number: (416) 368-9990

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHUNG-HAN JOHN HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2002