Ho, Edwin Chun Wing (CPSO#: 93897)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Cardiology
6-050Q
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Hospital
General Site
Department of Medicine
3050 Lawrence Street East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Cardiology
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B1B8
Canada
Phone: 9058487100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Alta Cardiac Care
8707 Dufferin Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A2
Canada
Phone: 9057470808
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Noble Medical and Diagnostics
Suite 002
10350 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C5K9
Canada
Phone: 9052375433
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: 9054727000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWIN CHUN WING HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 21 Sep 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014