Ho, Harmony Andrea (CPSO#: 82674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: (416) 922-0840
Fax: (416) 922-2818
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

IVF Canada
2347 Kennedy Road, Suite 304
Toronto ON  M1T 3T8
Canada
Phone: (416) 754-1010
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Mark Leung & Harmony Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Leung ( CPSO# 84934 )
Dr. H. Ho ( CPSO# 82674 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone Number: (416) 992-0840

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 25 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARMONY ANDREA HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2012