Ho, Jenny Mei-Yen (CPSO#: 82549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Haematology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNY MEI-YEN HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 05 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 06 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2018