Ho, Karen Cin Ting (CPSO#: 88342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 7734
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Emergency Department, Uxbridge Site
Markham Stouffville Hospital
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Canada
Phone: (905) 852-9771
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Emergency Department
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: 905-472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen C.T. Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ho ( CPSO# 88342 )

Business Address:
Emergency Department
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Business Address:
Markham-Stouffville Hospital
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN CIN TING HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2011