Ho, Karen (CPSO#: 90683)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
343 Booth Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 7K1
Phone: (613) 233-3030
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ho ( CPSO# 90683 )

Business Address:
Booth Neurology
343 Booth Street
Unit B
Ottawa ON  K1R 7K1
Phone Number: (613) 233-3030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014