Ho, Melissa Wei-Yee (CPSO#: 93147)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6520
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: 416-461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melissa Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ho ( CPSO# 93147 )

Business Address:
225 - 162 Cumberland Street
Toronto ON  M3R 3N5
Phone Number: (416) 925-0113

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6520

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA WEI-YEE HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015