Ho, Michael Long (CPSO#: 97832)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
F Main Room 206
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Fax: (613) 761-5488
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Long Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ho ( CPSO# 97832 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
F Main Room 206
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL LONG HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017