Ho, Wen-Huan Steve (CPSO#: 94337)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013