Ho Yuen, Vernon (CPSO#: 75973)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101-111 Kootenay St N
Cranbrook BC  V1C 3T5
Phone: (250) 426-7997
Fax: (250) 426-7987
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 101
111 Kootenay St N
Cranbrook BC  V1C 3T5
Canada
Phone: (250) 426-7997
Fax: (250) 426-7987
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VERNON HO YUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO YUEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2006