Hobbs, Cynthia Anne (CPSO#: 67796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: 7057432121 Ext. 3961
Fax: 705-876-5836
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Canada
Phone: (705) 653-1140 Ext. 2139
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cynthia Hobbs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hobbs ( CPSO# 67796 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5021

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA ANNE HOBBS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOBBS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1999 to 19 Nov 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2015