Hocke, Volker Stephan (CPSO#: 90356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Philipps University at Marburg, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6861
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V.S. Hocke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Hocke ( CPSO# 90356 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6861

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Germany

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VOLKER STEPHAN HOCKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOCKE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Nov 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2017