Hodge, Jeffrey William Henry (CPSO#: 91334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1221 Algonquin Ave
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Canada
Phone: 705-476-6228
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Hodge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hodge ( CPSO# 91334 )

Business Address:
1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone Number: (705) 476-6228

Business Address:
217 Turcotte Park Road
Mattawa ON  P0H 1V0
Phone Number: (705) 744-5511

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Mattawa General Hospital Mattawa
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY WILLIAM HENRY HODGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014