Hoffman, David Verne (CPSO#: 19938)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Hoffman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Port Arthur Health Centre 194 Court St N Thunder Bay, ON P7A 4V7 Tel: 807-346-1000
Instructions: Medical records location as per above.
Date Received: 02 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2018