Hoffman, Hayley Brooke (CPSO#: 95606)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2409 Yonge Street, Suite 200
Toronto ON  M4P 2E7
Phone: 416-256-4707
Fax: 416-256-4710
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hayley Hoffman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hoffman ( CPSO# 95606 )

Business Address:
2409 Yonge Street
Suite 200
Toronto ON  M4P 2E7
Phone Number: (416) 256-4707

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAYLEY BROOKE HOFFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOFFMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2014