Hofmann, Adam (CPSO#: 89955)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital Regional De Saint-Jérôme
290 Rue de Montigny
Saint-Jérôme QC  J7Z 5T3
Phone: (450) 432-2777

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients may retrieve their medical records from the hospitals where they were treated.
Date Received: 26 May 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM HOFMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOFMANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Oct 2008 to 14 Nov 2008
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017