Hogan, Michael Patrick (CPSO#: 82101)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2005 to 04 Feb 2005
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012