Holder, Natasha Alana (CPSO#: 91410)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University College, Cork, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
102-201 Deacon St.
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone: (613) 732-2164
Fax: (613) 732-2158
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natasha Holder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Holder ( CPSO# 91410 )

Business Address:
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Business Address:
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Business Address:
102 - 201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone Number: (613) 732-2164

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATASHA ALANA HOLDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 09 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 17 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014