Holland, Anna Currie (CPSO#: 98124)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prince Edward Medical
Unit 2
324 Prince Edward Drive South
Toronto ON  M8Y 3Z5
Phone: (647) 345-3048
Fax: (647) 345-3058
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1290 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6H 1N9
Canada
Phone: (416) 537-7000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA CURRIE HOLLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2014