Hollett-Caines, Jackie Roxane (CPSO#: 73542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: Hollett, Jackie Roxane (used until: 08 Dec 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Fertility Clinic LHSC VH
L H S C E3 638
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 646-6103
Fax: (519) 646-6324
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6103
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

OMEGA Fertility Clinic
107 - 555 Southdale Rd. E.
London ON  N6E 1A2
Canada
Phone: 519-685-5559
Fax: 519-685-5519
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Hollett-Caines Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hollett-Caines ( CPSO# 73542 )

Business Address:
E3 - 638
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9

Business Address:
Suite 107
555 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 1A2

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6103

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACKIE ROXANE HOLLETT-CAINES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLETT-CAINES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2004