Holman, Daniel John (CPSO#: 96135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rideau Crossing Family
Health Centre
90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-0100
Fax: (613) 258-6171
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Holman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Holman ( CPSO# 96135 )

Business Address:
Rideau Crossing Family Health Centre
90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-0100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL JOHN HOLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2013