Holmes, Roger Gordon (CPSO#: 25805)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roger Holmes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 25 May 2018


Address: DocuDavit Solutions, 28 Eugene Street, Toronto, ON, M6B 3Z4, Tel: 416-781-9083, 1-888-781-9083, Fax: 1-866-297-9338, Website: www.docudavit.com. Downtown Toronto Office: 1200 - 121 Richmond Street West, Toronto, ON, M6B 3Z4.
Date Received: 04 Jan 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018