Holowaty, Melissa Nicolle (CPSO#: 89122)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Madoc Street
P O Box 520
Marmora ON  K0K 2M0
Phone: (613) 472-2552
Fax: (613) 472-6135
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

70 Murphy Street
Trenton ON  K8V 0A8
Canada
Phone: 613-965-0698
Fax: 613-962-4149
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L1L0
Canada
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Holowaty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Holowaty ( CPSO# 89122 )

Business Address:
70 Murphy Street
Trenton ON  K8V 0A8
Phone Number: (613) 965-0698

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0

Business Address:
1 Madoc Street
P O Box 520
Marmora ON  K0K 2M0
Phone Number: (613) 472-2552

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA NICOLLE HOLOWATY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLOWATY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 03 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Jan 2010 to 03 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2011