Holt, Martha (CPSO#: 84387)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Names: Klosevych-Holt, Martha (used until: 12 Feb 2009 )     Klosevych, Martha (used until: 16 Jul 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
75 Bruyere St
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C7
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Fax: (613) 241-1971
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Feb 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTHA HOLT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 09 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2009